Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/20/2017 at 23:42:19 (UTC).

Simitrio N Martinez vs. Filimon Martinez

Case Summary

On 11/24/2003 Simitrio N Martinez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Filimon Martinez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3775

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martinez, Simitrio N

Houston, TX 77087

Defendant

Martinez, Filimon

Houston, TX 77086

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martinez, Ralph R

2900 Woodridge, Suite 202

Houston, TX 77087

Defendant Attorney

Reyes, Frumencio, Jr

3715 N. Main St

Houston, TX 77009

Other Attorneys

Reyes, Frumencio Jr

Martinez, Ralph Ramiro

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2004
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2004
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2003
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Thu Aug 26 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Jun 14 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Apr 19 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Martinez, Simitrio N; Parties Against: Martinez, Filimon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2004
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYES JR, FRUMENCIO