Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/13/2017 at 18:39:58 (UTC).

Sage Hollow Apartments vs. Sonia Luna

Case Summary

On 10/14/2004 Sage Hollow Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Sonia Luna. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3499

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sage Hollow Apartments

10700 Fuqua

Houston, TX 77089

Defendant

Luna, Sonia

Houston, TX 77089

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2004
  • Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Thu Oct 28 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Sage Hollow Apartments; Parties Against: Luna, Sonia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • Disposition: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less