Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/19/2017 at 17:23:03 (UTC).

Rosa 's Auto Sales Inc vs. Jose Luis Almaraz, Sergio Mireles

Case Summary

On 07/28/2003 Rosa 's Auto Sales Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jose Luis Almaraz, Sergio Mireles. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3501

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosa's Auto Sales Inc

408 Sgt Macario Garcia Dr

Houston, TX 77011

Defendants

Almaraz, Jose Luis

Houston, TX 77020

Mireles, Sergio

Houston, TX 77020

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Rodriguez, Raul

3801 Barnett

Houston, TX 77017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2004
  • Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Thu Oct 14 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu May 13 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Apr 08 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Apr 05 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Mar 11 09:00:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Feb 19 09:00:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Rosa's Auto Sales Inc; Parties Against: Almaraz, Jose Luis and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Disposition: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less