Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/20/2017 at 06:46:26 (UTC).

Raul Ayala vs. Feldman & Cramer, O.W.O. Investments Inc

Case Summary

On 10/06/2003 Raul Ayala filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Feldman Cramer, O W O Investments Inc. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3653

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ayala, Raul

Houston, TX 77023

Defendants

Feldman & Cramer

2220 South Blvd

Houston, TX 77098-5225

O.W.O. Investments Inc

2220 South Boulevard

Houston, TX 77098

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2004
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2004
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2003
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Thu May 27 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Mar 15 09:00:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Ayala, Raul; Parties Against: Feldman & Cramer; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less