Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/18/2017 at 03:21:52 (UTC).

Plpa Management vs. Lester Williams

Case Summary

On 03/26/2003 Plpa Management filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Lester Williams. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3251

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Plpa Management

P.O. Box 2547

Sugar Land, TX 77479

Defendant

Williams, Lester

Houston, TX 77009

Other

Grandich, Mark J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ballard, James

7322 Southwest Freeway Suite 816

Houston, TX 77074

Other Attorneys

Ballard, James L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2003
  • Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2003
  • Eviction-Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2003
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2003
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2003
  • Eviction-Citation Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion Date: Thu Apr 24 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2003
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Mon Apr 07 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2003
  • Judgment: Parties For: Plpa Management; Parties Against: Williams, Lester

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2003
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less