Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/13/2017 at 18:39:30 (UTC).

Oakhurst Realty vs. Dearest C Johnson Etal

Case Summary

On 10/14/2004 Oakhurst Realty filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Dearest C Johnson Etal. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1824

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oakhurst Realty

4141 North Freeway #124

Houston, TX 77022

Defendants

Dearest C Johnson Etal

Johnson, Dearest

Houston, TX 77078

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2004
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • Event: Eviction Docket; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Thu Oct 28 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Oakhurst Realty; Parties Against: Johnson, Dearest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • Disposition: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less