Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/22/2017 at 22:05:04 (UTC).

Michael Alonzo, Cosme Deleon vs. Sam Said

Case Summary

On 02/27/2002 Michael Alonzo, Cosme Deleon filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Sam Said. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2480

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2002

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

Alonzo, Michael

Houston, TX 77020

Deleon, Cosme

Houston, TX 77020

Said, Sam

Houston, TX 77074

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

Said, Sam

Houston, TX 77074

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Simmons, Richard Allen

15150 Middlebrook Drive

Houston, TX 77058

Other Attorneys

Simmons, Richard A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2002
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2002
  • Dismissed wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2002
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2002
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2002
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2002
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2002
  • Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2002
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2002
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2002
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2002
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2002
  • Event: Jury Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Fri Aug 09 09:00:00 CDT 2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2002
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Apr 29 09:00:00 CDT 2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2002
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Apr 22 09:00:00 CDT 2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2002
  • Judgment: Parties For: Alonzo, Michael; Parties Against: Said, Sam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2002
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Simmons, Richard A