Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/13/2017 at 18:41:55 (UTC).

Marina Barragan vs. Steve Medina, Zee Wrecker

Case Summary

On 10/14/2004 Marina Barragan filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Steve Medina, Zee Wrecker. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4449

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barragan, Marina

Houston, TX 77023

Defendants

Medina, Steve

Houston, TX 77005

Zee Wrecker

Bellaire, TX 77401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2006
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2006
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2006
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2006
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2005
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2005
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2005
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2005
  • Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2006
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Fri Jun 30 09:00:00 CDT 2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2006
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Fri Jun 09 09:00:00 CDT 2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2006
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Fri May 12 09:00:00 CDT 2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2006
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Fri Apr 21 09:00:00 CDT 2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2006
  • Judgment: Parties For: Barragan, Marina; Parties Against: Medina, Steve and others; Post-Judgment Interest: 8.00%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2006
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less