Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/20/2017 at 04:13:13 (UTC).

Maria B Sandoval vs. Yessenia R Cherry, Sara Fernandez

Case Summary

On 09/22/2003 Maria B Sandoval filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Yessenia R Cherry, Sara Fernandez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3633

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandoval, Maria B

Houston, TX 77023

Defendants

Cherry, Yessenia R

Decatur, TX 76234

Fernandez, Sara

Decatur, TX 76234

Other

Hummel, Eric Stephen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2004
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2004
  • Event: Jury Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Fri Aug 13 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2004
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Apr 05 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2004
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Mar 08 09:00:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2004
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Mar 01 09:00:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Sandoval, Maria B; Parties Against: Cherry, Yessenia R and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2004
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less