Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/22/2017 at 19:11:04 (UTC).

Luis Duenez, Maria C Garza vs. Juan Perez

Case Summary

On 02/11/2002 Luis Duenez, Maria C Garza filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Juan Perez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2446

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Duenez, Luis

Pasadena, TX 77506

Garza, Maria C

Pasadena, TX 77506

Defendant

Perez, Juan

Houston, TX 77075

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2012
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2005
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2002
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2002
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2002
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2002
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2002
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2002
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2002
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2002
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2002
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2002
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2002
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Thu May 09 09:00:00 CDT 2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2002
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Apr 25 09:00:00 CDT 2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2002
  • Judgment: Parties For: Duenez, Luis; Parties Against: Perez, Juan; Post-Judgment Interest: 10.00%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2002
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less