Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/21/2017 at 01:51:05 (UTC).

Lucina Cruz vs. Everardo Rosales, Rolando Rosales

Case Summary

On 12/08/2003 Lucina Cruz filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Everardo Rosales, Rolando Rosales. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3790

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cruz, Lucina

Houston, TX 77017

Defendants

Rosales, Rolando

Houston, TX 77017

Rosales, Everardo

Houston, TX 77017

Other

Villagomez, Ramon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2005
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2004
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2003
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Thu Jun 24 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon May 24 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu May 20 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Apr 19 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Cruz, Lucina; Parties Against: Rosales, Everardo; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2004
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less