Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/26/2017 at 00:58:52 (UTC).

Julio Fat vs. Dalat Condo

Case Summary

On 12/20/2002 Julio Fat filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Dalat Condo. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3062

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2002

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fat, Julio

Houston, TX 77017

Defendant

Dalat Condo

Houston, TX 77017

Material Witness

Nguyen, Peter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Valdes, Fernando Francisco

2600 South Shore Blvd Suite 300

League City, TX 77573

Defendant Attorney

Le, Tot Kim

1005 St Emanuel Suite 206

Houston, TX 77003

Other Attorneys

Valdes, Fernando F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2003
  • Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2004
  • Event: Jury Trial; Completion Date: Fri Jun 04 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2004
  • Event: Jury Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Fri Apr 23 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2004
  • Event: Jury Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Fri Feb 13 09:00:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2003
  • Event: Jury Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Fri Nov 07 09:00:00 CST 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2003
  • Event: Jury Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Fri Oct 10 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2003
  • Event: Jury Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Fri Aug 22 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Apr 03 09:00:00 CST 2003

    Read MoreRead Less