Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/17/2017 at 22:53:33 (UTC).

Juliana Aguneri vs. Kroger Store #156

Case Summary

On 03/03/2003 Juliana Aguneri filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Kroger Store 156. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3181

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aguneri, Juliana

Houston, TX 77053

Defendant

Kroger Store #156

6322 Telephone Rd

Houston, TX 77017

Material Witness

Williams, Andre

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Akers, Brock C

3200 S West Frwy3400

Houston, TX 77027

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2004
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • Subpoena Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2003
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2004
  • Event: Jury Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Fri Apr 30 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • Event: Jury Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Fri Mar 05 09:00:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2003
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Dec 18 09:00:00 CST 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Nov 06 09:00:00 CST 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Jul 10 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Aguneri, Juliana; Parties Against: Kroger Store #156

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2004
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKERS, BROCK C.