Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/18/2017 at 19:17:02 (UTC).

John Juanopulos Dba J &A Paint & Bod vs. Houston Auto Service Aka Houston Auto Sales

Case Summary

On 05/13/2003 John Juanopulos Dba J A Paint Bod filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Houston Auto Service Aka Houston Auto Sales. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3347

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2003

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Juanopulos Dba J&A Paint & Bod

John Juanopulos Dba J &A Paint & Bod

Houston, TX 77026

Defendants

Houston Auto Service Aka Houston

6522 Cullen

Houston, TX 77021

Houston Auto Service Aka Houston Auto Sales

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Canterbury, Kristine A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2003
  • Dismissed wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2003
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Thu Jul 24 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2003
  • Judgment: Parties For: John Juanopulos Dba J&A Paint & Bod; Parties Against: Houston Auto Service Aka Houston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2003
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSTON'S is a litigant