This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/22/2018 at 21:17:55 (UTC).

Huffman Independent School District vs. J.A.M.V. Lp Dba Sonic of Huffman

Case Summary

On 07/06/2009 Huffman Independent School District filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J A M. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3720

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Huffman Independent School District

Defendant

J.A.M.V. Lp Dba Sonic of Huffman

23508 Twin Oaks Drive

Spring, TX 77389

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darlow, Michael J

1235 North Loop West Suite 600

Houston, TX 77008

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2009
  • Conversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2009
  • Answer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • Conversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • Original Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • Judgment: Parties For: Huffman Independent School District; Parties Against: J.A.M.V. Lp Dba Sonic of Huffman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jamv, Inc. dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where HUFFMAN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DARLOW, MICHAEL J.