Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/10/2017 at 18:17:29 (UTC).

G & C Bookkeeping Inc vs. Paul Radaker, James W Nuckolls

Case Summary

On 01/21/2004 G C Bookkeeping Inc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Paul Radaker, James W Nuckolls. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3888

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G & C Bookkeeping Inc

Defendants

Nuckolls, James W

Houston, TX 77011

Radaker, Paul

Houston, TX 77011

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mercurio, Andrew P

5959 West Loop South Ste 500

Bellaire, TX 77401

Defendant Attorney

Andres, Robert Joseph

P O Box 690327

Houston, TX 77269

Other Attorneys

Mercurio, Andrew Paul

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2004
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2004
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2004
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2004
  • Event: Hearing; Completion Date: Thu Feb 26 09:00:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Mon Feb 09 13:30:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Feb 02 09:00:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: G & C Bookkeeping Inc; Parties Against: Radaker, Paul and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less