Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/13/2017 at 18:43:27 (UTC).

Edgebrook Apts vs. Nidia Bryand

Case Summary

On 10/14/2004 Edgebrook Apts filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Nidia Bryand. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3521

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edgebrook Apts

101 E Edgebrook

Houston, TX 77034

Defendant

Bryand, Nidia

Houston, TX 77034

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2004
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Thu Oct 28 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Edgebrook Apts; Parties Against: Bryand, Nidia; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less