Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/17/2017 at 19:52:55 (UTC).

Diana M Sanchez vs. Rafael Coronado

Case Summary

On 02/13/2003 Diana M Sanchez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Rafael Coronado. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3152

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanchez, Diana M

Houston, TX 77020

Defendant

Coronado, Rafael

Houston, TX 77020

Not Classified By Court

Powell, Gregory

Farrell, Tambara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lord, Paul A U

2500 Tanglewilde

Houston, TX 77063

Defendant Attorney

Greene, Thomas R

2317 Stanford

Houston, TX 77006

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2005
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2005
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2004
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2004
  • Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2004
  • Subpoena Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2004
  • Subpoena Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2003
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2004
  • Event: Jury Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Fri Aug 06 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2004
  • Event: Jury Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Fri May 14 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Sanchez, Diana M; Parties Against: Coronado, Rafael; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2004
  • Disposition: Agreed Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less