Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/13/2017 at 18:45:07 (UTC).

Crosby Green Apts vs. Annie Ardoin

Case Summary

On 10/14/2004 Crosby Green Apts filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Annie Ardoin. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4471

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crosby Green Apts

3529 Crosby Cedar Bayou

Baytown, TX 77520

Defendant

Ardoin, Annie

Baytown, TX 77521

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2004
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Eviction-Citation Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Tue Oct 26 10:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Crosby Green Apts; Parties Against: Ardoin, Annie; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2004
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less