Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/13/2017 at 18:39:26 (UTC).

Celluphone of Texas Inc vs. Basit Al Khan Dba Airlink Communications

Case Summary

On 10/14/2004 Celluphone of Texas Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Basit Al Khan Dba Airlink Communications. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6371

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Celluphone of Texas Inc

5802 Val Verde St, Ste A01

Houston, TX 77057

Defendants

Basit Al Khan Dba Airling Communications

Stafford, TX 77477-7

Basit Al Khan Dba Airlink Communications

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2005
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2004
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2005
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Tue Sep 13 09:00:00 CDT 2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue May 31 09:00:00 CDT 2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2005
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Mar 15 09:00:00 CST 2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2005
  • Judgment: Parties For: Celluphone of Texas Inc; Parties Against: Basit Al Khan Dba Airling Communications; Post-Judgment Interest: 6.50%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2005
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less