Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/18/2017 at 18:16:01 (UTC).

Camilo T Garza vs. Santos Cardenas

Case Summary

On 05/08/2003 Camilo T Garza filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Santos Cardenas. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3337

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garza, Camilo T

Friendswood, TX 77546

Defendant

Cardenas, Santos

Houston, TX 77011

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barrientos, H. Frank

5615 Harrisburg Blvd

Houston, TX 77011-4319

Defendant Attorney

Anderson, Kathryn P

5629 Fm 1960 West, Suite 106

Houston, TX 77069

Other Attorneys

Barrientos, Hector F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2006
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2004
  • Dismissed wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2004
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2003
  • Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Thu Oct 21 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2004
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Oct 07 09:00:00 CDT 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Garza, Camilo T; Parties Against: Cardenas, Santos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2004
  • Disposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less