Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/20/2017 at 00:23:29 (UTC).

Bernard Bolanos vs. Zeferino Leauvano

Case Summary

On 09/04/2003 Bernard Bolanos filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Zeferino Leauvano. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3579

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bolanos, Bernard

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant

Leauvano, Zeferino

Houston, TX 77032

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saldivar, Israel, Jr

P.O. Box 3163

Houston, TX 77253-3163

Other Attorneys

Saldivar Jr, Israel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2004
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2004
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2003
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2004
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Mon Feb 23 09:00:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Bolanos, Bernard; Parties Against: Leauvano, Zeferino; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2004
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less