Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/24/2017 at 20:04:54 (UTC).

Andreas I Jones vs. Aes/Key Corp Trust 1996 A, Windham Professionals Inc

Case Summary

On 08/26/2002 Andreas I Jones filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Aes/Key Corp Trust 1996 A, Windham Professionals Inc. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2849

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jones, Andreas I

Houston, TX 77024-1508

Defendants

Windham Professionals Inc

350 North St Paul Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Aes/Key Corp Trust 1996 A

1200 North 7Th Street

Harrisburg, PA 17102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walker, Robert A

2425 West Loop South 2Nd Floor

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorneys

Wier, Keith

5718 Westheimer Suite 1750

Houston, TX 77057

Altamira, Marilyn Sue

5847 San Felipe Suite 2200

Houston, TX 77057

Other Attorneys

Walker, Rob

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2003
  • Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2002
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2002
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Aug 18 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Jun 30 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Jun 05 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Apr 24 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Mar 06 09:00:00 CST 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Jan 27 09:00:00 CST 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2002
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Mon Nov 25 09:00:00 CST 2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2002
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Oct 17 09:00:00 CDT 2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Thu Oct 09 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2002
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Sep 26 09:00:00 CDT 2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2003
  • Judgment: Parties For: Jones, Andreas I; Parties Against: Aes/Key Corp Trust 1996 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2003
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less