Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/18/2017 at 16:56:00 (UTC).

Al 's Plumbing Company vs. Whitley Construction

Case Summary

On 04/30/2003 Al 's Plumbing Company filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Whitley Construction. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3325

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Al's Plumbing Company

4911 Silsbee St

Pearland, TX 77584

Defendant

Whitley Construction

11614 Havard Oaks Dr

Houston, TX 77095

Not Classified By Court

Gonzales, Albert

Whitley, Chip

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

McCaig, Albert M, Jr

P.O. Box 760

Waller, TX 77484

Other Attorneys

McCaig Jr, Albert M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2004
  • Transfer Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2003
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2003
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2003
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2003
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2004
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Held; Completion Date: Thu Feb 19 09:00:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2004
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Jan 15 09:00:00 CST 2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Oct 23 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2003
  • Event: Hearing; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Oct 16 09:00:00 CDT 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2004
  • Judgment: Parties For: Al's Plumbing Company; Parties Against: Whitley Construction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2004
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less