This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/03/2020 at 03:16:49 (UTC).

Yang Han vs. Walter Efrain Portillo, Andrea Hailey Portillo

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Yang Han filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Walter Efrain Portillo, Andrea Hailey Portillo. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8640

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Han, Yang

Huffman, TX 77336

Defendants

Portillo, Andrea Hailey

Katy, TX 77493

Portillo, Walter Efrain

Katy, TX 77493

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Payment Information: Amount: $196.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Han, Yang

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Other; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Fri Dec 20 15:30:00 CST 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Judgment: Parties For: Han, Yang; Parties Against: Portillo, Walter Efrain and others; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.