This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/27/2022 at 05:06:15 (UTC).

Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee Of CVI AMR Investment Trust vs. Monique M Henderson

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee Of CVI AMR Investment Trust filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Monique M Henderson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4231

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee Of CVI AMR Investment Trust

Defendant

Henderson, Monique M

Channelview,, TX 77530-4725

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Friday, Lacie Elizabeth

P O Box 7811

Sandy, UT 84091-7811

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketResponse Due Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee Of CVI AMR Investment Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lacie Friday