This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/10/2023 at 04:29:20 (UTC).

Villas at Eastwood vs. Otis Hardaway

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Villas at Eastwood filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Otis Hardaway. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1868

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Villas at Eastwood

Defendant

Hardaway, Otis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fulton, Kevin

Defendant Attorney

Leticia, Leal

Other Attorneys

Roberts, Mark E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketWrit Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Villas at Eastwood

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession-Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Villas at Eastwood; Parties Against: Hardaway, Otis; Post-Judgment Interest: 7.5000%; Judgment Amount: $620.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $108.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Villas at Eastwood

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less