This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/09/2018 at 16:57:30 (UTC).

Ventana at Midtown vs. Michael Ownby

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 Ventana at Midtown filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Michael Ownby. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3420

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ventana at Midtown

4001 Fannin St

Houston, TX 77004

Defendant

Ownby, Michael

Houston, TX 77004

Not Classified By Court

Ta, Duc

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2017
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Eviction-Notice of Default Judgment 510.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Eviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $116.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Ventana at Midtown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Event: Eviction Docket; Completion: Default Judgment; Completion Date: Thu May 11 09:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Event: Eviction Docket; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Apr 27 09:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less