This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/09/2018 at 15:57:56 (UTC).

U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust vs. Petual Broussard, Charles Broussard and/or All Occupants

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 U S Bank Trust, N A as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Petual Broussard, Charles Broussard and/or All Occupants. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7122

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust

Defendants

Charles Broussard and/or All Occupants

Houston, TX 77021

Broussard, Petual

Houston, TX 77021

Not Classified By Court

Minneweather, Blythe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O, Boyle, Jack

P.O.Box 815369

Dallas, TX 75381

Other Attorneys

Kesler, Rex L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2017
  • Order-Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Motion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Eviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $191.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Event: Eviction Docket; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Thu Apr 20 09:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Event: Eviction Docket; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Apr 13 09:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Event: Eviction Docket; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Apr 06 09:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KESLER, REX L.