This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/29/2018 at 18:01:56 (UTC).

Us Bank National Association As Trustee for the C-Bass Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-Cb5 vs. Carmen Barron

Case Summary

On 11/26/2012 Us Bank National Association As Trustee for the C-Bass Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-Cb5 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Carmen Barron. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6578

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Us Bank National Association As Trustee for the C-Bass Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-Cb5

Defendant

BARRON, CARMEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAUCEDO, ISRAEL

Pkwy Office Ctr, Ste 900 14160 N Dallas Parkway

Dallas, TX 75254

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2013
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Us Bank National Association As Trustee for the C-Bass Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-Cb5; Parties Against: Barron, Carmen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • DocketDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAUCEDO, ISRAEL