Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/11/2017 at 00:13:20 (UTC).

United Natural Foods Inc. vs. Novus Concepts #1 Llc Aka and Dba Freshii and Freshi-Novus Concepts, Javier Bueno

Case Summary

On 10/25/2011 United Natural Foods Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Novus Concepts 1 Llc Aka and Dba Freshii and Freshi-Novus Concepts, Javier Bueno. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9184

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Natural Foods Inc.

Defendants

Bueno, Javier

Novus Concepts #1 Llc Aka and Dba Freshii and Freshi-Novus Concepts

Anthony F. Newton/Ra 1531 Eldridge Rd Ste 190

Houston, TX 77077

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Totz, Jon D

P O Box 570548

Houston, TX 77257

Defendant Attorney

Steidley, Darrell Mark

2990 Richmond Ave Ste 400

Houston, TX 77098

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2012
  • Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2012
  • Judgment: Parties For: United Natural Foods Inc.; Parties Against: Novus Concepts #1 Llc Aka and Dba Freshii and Freshi-Novus Concepts and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2012
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Natural Foods, Inc. is a litigant