This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 05/24/2023 at 04:17:25 (UTC).

Unifund CCR LLC vs. Jesse Herrera

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 Unifund CCR LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jesse Herrera. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5969

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unifund CCR LLC

Defendant

Herrera, Jesse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thames, Marlei E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketPending Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2023
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Unifund CCR LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less