Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/09/2018 at 16:39:07 (UTC).

Toyota Motor Credit Corporation vs. Jesus Alarcon-Arredondo AKA Jesus J Alarcon AKA Jesus Javier Alarcon-Arredondo

Case Summary

On 04/05/2017 Toyota Motor Credit Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jesus Alarcon-Arredondo AKA Jesus J Alarcon AKA Jesus Javier Alarcon-Arredondo. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0324

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Toyota Motor Credit Corporation

19001 South Western Avenue

Torrance, CA 90501

Defendant

Jesus Alarcon-Arredondo AKA Jesus J Alarcon AKA Jesus Javier Alarcon-Arredondo

Cypress, TX 77433

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melamed, Marc A

275 W Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Melamed, Marc Arnold

275 W Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant Attorney

Weston, Michael W

5001 Bissonnet Suite 200

Bellaire, TX 77401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • Order-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Order-Pretrial Discovery 500.9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Proposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Motion for Discovery Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Debt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Thu Nov 16 09:00:00 CST 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Sep 12 09:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Disposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Toyota Motor Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melamed, Marc A