This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/31/2018 at 14:23:18 (UTC).

Tomball Texas Hospital Company, LLC D/B/A Tomball Regional Medical Center vs. Amanda Gorham, Matthew Gorham

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 Tomball Texas Hospital Company, LLC D/B/A Tomball Regional Medical Center filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Amanda Gorham, Matthew Gorham. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7121

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tomball Texas Hospital Company, LLC D/B/A Tomball Regional Medical Center

6440 N. Central Expressway, Ste 850

Dallas, TX 75206

Defendants

Gorham, Amanda

Humble, TX 77388-4330

Gorham, Matthew

Spring, TX 77388-4330

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Deloney, Christopher Robert

6440 N Central Expressway Ste. 850

Dallas, TX 75206

Other Attorneys

Deloney, Christopher R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Proposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Tomball Texas Hospital Company, LLC D/B/A Tomball Regional Medical Center

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Other; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Tue Dec 12 13:00:00 CST 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Tomball Texas Hospital Company, LLC D/B/A Tomball Regional Medical Center; Parties Against: Gorham, Amanda and others; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $7188.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less