This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/10/2018 at 05:28:21 (UTC).

Tomball Texas Company, LLC D/B/A Tomball Regional Medical Center vs. Billy Williams

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 Tomball Texas Company, LLC D/B/A Tomball Regional Medical Center filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Billy Williams. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7047

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tomball Texas Company, LLC D/B/A Tomball Regional Medical Center

6440 N. Central Expressway Ste. 850

Dallas, TX 75206

Defendant

Williams, Billy

Houston, TX 77066

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Deloney, Christopher Robert

6440 N Central Expressway Ste. 850

Dallas, TX 75206

Defendant Attorney

Gilpin, Patrick Joseph, Jr

1400 Broadfield Blvd Ste 200

Houston, TX 77084

Other Attorneys

Deloney, Christopher R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • Order-Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Agreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Tomball Texas Company, LLC D/B/A Tomball Regional Medical Center

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Agreed Resolution; Completion Date: Tue Jan 30 08:30:00 CST 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion: Agreed Resolution; Completion Date: Thu Jan 11 13:00:00 CST 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Disposition: Agreed Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less