This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/10/2018 at 12:26:56 (UTC).

Timber Lane Community Improvement Association, INC vs. SFR-HOU I LLC

Case Summary

On 08/09/2017 Timber Lane Community Improvement Association, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SFR-HOU I LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2349

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timber Lane Community Improvement Association, INC

Defendant

SFR-HOU I LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Beard, John

9219 Katy Freeway Suite 106

Houston, TX 77024

Beard, John W

9219 Katy Freeway Suite 106

Houston, TX 77024

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • Order-Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Motion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Proposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Citation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Citation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $55.74; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Timber Lane Community Improvement Association, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Event: Default Docket; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Tue Oct 10 13:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Event: Default Docket; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Oct 10 13:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less