This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/28/2018 at 15:36:48 (UTC).

Timber Lane Community Improvement Association, INC vs. Gregory Cornelius

Case Summary

On 07/28/2017 Timber Lane Community Improvement Association, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gregory Cornelius. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9563

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timber Lane Community Improvement Association, INC

Defendant

Cornelius, Gregory

Spring, TX 77373

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Beard, John

9219 Katy Freeway Suite 106

Houston, TX 77024

Beard, John W

9219 Katy Freeway Suite 106

Houston, TX 77024

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2017
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Proposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Citation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Citation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $55.74; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Timber Lane Community Improvement Association, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Timber Lane Community Improvement Association, INC; Parties Against: Cornelius, Gregory; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less