This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/05/2018 at 19:07:01 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Stephen Christoher Ligon Aka Stephen C. Ligon Aka Stephen Ligon

Case Summary

On 04/10/2013 The State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Stephen Christoher Ligon Aka Stephen C Ligon Aka Stephen Ligon. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2159

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE STATE OF TEXAS

Defendants

STEPHEN CHRISTOHER LIGON AKA STEPHEN C. LIGON AKA STEPHEN LIGON

Spring, TX 77379

LIGON, ANDRE L

Houston, TX 77002

Ligon, Stephen C

Spring, TX 77379

Not Classified By Court

Harris County Treasurer Fee Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADDOCK, KATHLEEN A.B

Braddock, Kathy

1201 Franklin Suite 600

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Bond Forfeiture-Writ of Execution Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Judgment: Parties For: The State of Texas; Parties Against: Ligon, Stephen C and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less