This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/24/2018 at 05:47:56 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs. Phong Thanh Tran

Case Summary

On 07/15/2011 The State of Texas filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Phong Thanh Tran. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5885

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The State of Texas

Defendants

Tran, Phong Thanh

Houston, TX 77083

McCluskey, John

Phong Thanh Tran Aka Phong Tran

Houston, TX 77083

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Braddock, Kathy

1201 Franklin Suite 600

Houston, TX 77002

Other Attorneys

Braddock, Kathleen A.B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2011
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • Judgment: Parties For: The State of Texas; Parties Against: McCluskey, John and others; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less