This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 08/19/2021 at 04:34:54 (UTC).

The Sherwin Williams Company vs. K & P Painting LLC, Yessica Guevara

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 The Sherwin Williams Company filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against K P Painting LLC, Yessica Guevara. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8009

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Sherwin Williams Company

Defendants

K & P Painting LLC

Yessica Guevara, Registered Agent 7900 Bissonnet Street, #D10

Houston, TX 77074

Guevara, Yessica

Houston, TX 77074

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adair, Randall F

325 N St Paul Street Suite 4100

Dallas, TX 75201

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: The Sherwin Williams Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketConsent for Email Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Sherwin-Williams Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAIR, RANDALL F