Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/01/2019 at 14:42:03 (UTC).

The Presidio at Clear Lake vs. Brian Jasper, II

Case Summary

On 01/24/2017 The Presidio at Clear Lake filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Brian Jasper, II. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9597

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Presidio at Clear Lake

16201 El Camino Real

Houston, TX 77062

The Presidio at Clear Lake Apartments

16201 El Camino Real

Houston, TX 77062

Defendant

Jasper, Brian, II

Houston, TX 77062

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2017
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Eviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $116.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: The Presidio at Clear Lake Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Feb 09 14:00:00 CST 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: The Presidio at Clear Lake Apartments; Parties Against: Jasper, Brian, II; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1485.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Presidio at Clear Lake is a litigant