This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/04/2022 at 04:24:15 (UTC).

The Landmark at Auburn Lakes, LLC vs. Guillermo Cuevas Martinez, Itzel Zarco Islas

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 The Landmark at Auburn Lakes, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Guillermo Cuevas Martinez, Itzel Zarco Islas. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5132

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Landmark at Auburn Lakes, LLC

Defendants

Cuevas Martinez, Guillermo

Spring, TX 77389

Zarco Islas, Itzel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $183.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: The Landmark at Auburn Lakes, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Landmark at Auburn Lakes Llc is a litigant