This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/03/2022 at 04:18:23 (UTC).

The Landmark at Auburn Lakes Llc vs. Ashley Brooks

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 The Landmark at Auburn Lakes Llc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ashley Brooks. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2590

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Landmark at Auburn Lakes Llc

5755 W. Rayford

Spring, TX 77389

Defendant

Brooks, Ashley

Spring, TX 77389

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Landmark at Auburn Lakes Llc

5755 W. Rayford

Spring, TX 77389

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $108.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: The Landmark at Auburn Lakes Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Landmark at Auburn Lakes Llc is a litigant