This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/16/2022 at 06:19:59 (UTC).

The Carter vs. Ryan Crawford

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 The Carter filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ryan Crawford. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7239

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Carter

4 Chelsea Blvd

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant

Crawford, Ryan

Houston, TX 77006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bone, Robert Eldridge

1616 S. Voss, Suite 200

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorney

Calderon, Eddie Ray, Jr

1028 Edgebrook Drive

Houston, TX 77034

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOrder Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: The Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carter is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bone, Robert Eldrige