This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/16/2022 at 05:45:11 (UTC).

The Carter vs. Birttney Burns

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 The Carter filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Birttney Burns. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7252

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Carter

4 Chelsea Blvd

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant

Burns, Birttney

Houston, TX 77006

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: The Carter; Parties Against: Burns, Birttney; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $5937.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOrder-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEviction-Notice of Default Judgment 510.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: The Carter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carter is a litigant