Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/01/2019 at 14:11:14 (UTC).

TG SA Protection Corporation dba Top Gun Security & Investigations vs. Elva 's Pallets LLC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2017 TG SA Protection Corporation dba Top Gun Security Investigations filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Elva 's Pallets LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2348

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TG SA Protection Corporation dba Top Gun Security & Investigations

Defendant

Elva's Pallets LLC

6810 King Henry Street

San Antonio, TX 78229

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evans, Barry

550 Egret Bay Blvd

League City, TX 77573

Defendant Attorneys

Heston, James B

607 Park Grove Dr Suite B

Katy, TX 77450

Heston, James

P O Box 6049

Katy, TX 77491

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Writ of Execution-Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Citation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Citation by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $5.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: TG SA Protection Corporation dba Top Gun Security & Investigations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $5.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: TG SA Protection Corporation dba Top Gun Security & Investigations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $59.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: TG SA Protection Corporation dba Top Gun Security & Investigations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Jun 01 10:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: TG SA Protection Corporation dba Top Gun Security & Investigations; Parties Against: Elva's Pallets LLC; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $6577.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Heston

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HESTON, JAMES B