This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/22/2021 at 04:08:09 (UTC).

Td Bank Usa, N.A. vs. Sergio Lozano

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Td Bank Usa, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sergio Lozano. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3090

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Td Bank Usa, N.A.

Defendant

Lozano, Sergio

Houston, TX 77015-3515

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Addison, Brandi

15660 N Dallas Parkway, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant Attorney

Weston, Michael W

177 West Gray Street

Houston, TX 77019

Other Attorneys

Toben, Sarah Danielle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketResponse Due Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPending Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Td Bank Usa, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant