This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:09:54 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A. vs. Joey B Salazar

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 TD Bank USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Joey B Salazar. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8450

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA, N.A.

Defendant

Salazar, Joey B

Houston, TX 77040-1371

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ball, Roger Kyle

15660 N. Dallas Parkway Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPending Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: TD Bank USA, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less