This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/05/2018 at 06:46:31 (UTC).

Td Bank USA Na As Successor in Interest to Target National Bank vs. Valerie Y Brannon

Case Summary

On 10/16/2012 Td Bank USA Na As Successor in Interest to Target National Bank filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Valerie Y Brannon. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6487

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Td Bank USA Na As Successor in Interest to Target National Bank

Defendant

BRANNON, VALERIE Y

Receiver

Adams, Michael J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mikulik, Yvonne

15851 N. Dallas Parkway Suite 245

Addison, TX 75001

Other Attorneys

Jones, Stephen Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketOrder Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • DocketAmended Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketHearing: Motion Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Tue Jul 18 09:00:00 CDT 2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • DocketHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Td Bank USA Na As Successor in Interest to Target National Bank; Parties Against: Brannon, Valerie Y; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $3401.52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • DocketDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Thomas Jones