Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/25/2021 at 03:26:17 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. Victor Valadez

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Victor Valadez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2192

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

Defendant

Valadez, Victor

Houston, TX 77012

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scherer, George Colby

15660 N Dallas Parkway Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant Attorney

Fernandez, David A

2190 North Loop West Suite 333

Houston, TX 77018

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMotion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Synchrony Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fernandez, David A